FL S1658 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Commending Congress for granting trade promotion authority to the executive branch, urging the executive branch to negotiate a comprehensive and mutually beneficial free trade agreement between the United States and the United Kingdom, and urging Congress to ratify such agreement, etc.
Title
Free Trade Agreement Between the United States and the United Kingdom
Sponsors
Sen. Joe Gruters [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Commerce and Tourism |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Commerce and Tourism; Rules |
2020-01-09 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1307 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Local, Federal and Veterans Affairs Subcommittee
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1658 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1658/BillText/Filed/HTML |