FL S1662 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1249
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1249
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Providing that certain veterans and their surviving spouses receiving a certain homestead tax exemption may apply for and receive a prorated refund of property taxes paid on new homestead property acquired during a certain timeframe; requiring the property appraiser to immediately make certain entries upon the tax rolls to allow the prorated refund, etc.
Title
Property Tax Exemption for Disabled Veterans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1249 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Substituted CS/CS/HB 1249 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Favorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Favorable by Finance and Tax; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-13 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Finance and Tax, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Building |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Now in Finance and Tax |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-10 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/10/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Finance and Tax; Appropriations |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1249 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-140
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
196 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
196 | 081 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |