FL S1668 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the purposes that charter schools are authorized to fulfill; authorizing Florida College System institutions to sponsor charter schools within their respective service areas for a certain purpose and to offer postsecondary programs leading to industry certifications to eligible students; providing that the standard charter renewal contract be developed by consulting and negotiating with sponsors and charter schools, etc.
Title
School Choice
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Education |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1197 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
H7095 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
H7095 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/SB 7070 (Ch. 2019-23)
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1668 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1668/BillText/Filed/HTML |