FL S1670 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 3 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to waive fees for a birth certificate issued to certain juvenile offenders; providing an additional circumstance under which the court may order continued detention; requiring the court to place a prolific juvenile offender in certain detention care under a special detention order until disposition; revising the circumstances under which an adjudication of delinquency for a felony disqualifies a person from possessing a firearm, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Juvenile Justice

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-02SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164)
2017-05-02SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 7059
2017-05-02SenateRead 3rd time
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2017-04-27SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-26SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 04/27/17
2017-04-26SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-04-26SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2017-04-25SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2017-04-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 04/25/17, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-04-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-04-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2017-04-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/13/17, 1:00 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-03-28SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice
2017-03-27SenateFavorable by Criminal Justice; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-03-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 03/27/17, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Office Building
2017-03-15SenateIntroduced
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations
2017-03-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7059 (Similar To) 2017-06-26 - Chapter No. 2017-164
S1074 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3820255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
79022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985115Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98513Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98524Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985245Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98525Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98526Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985265Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98527Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985275Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985319Amended CodeSee Bill Text
98535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985514Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback