FL S1670 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Commerce and Tourism
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the use of personal data contained in public records for certain marketing, soliciting, and contact without the person's consent; requiring the operator of a website or online service that collects certain information from consumers in this state to establish a designated request address and provide specified notice regarding the collection and sale of such information; prohibiting such operator from making any sale of consumer information upon request of the consumer, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Consumer Data Privacy

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Commerce and Tourism
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Commerce and Tourism; Judiciary; Rules
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H963 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Oversight, Transparency and Public Management Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
11901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501062Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback