FL S1676 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Deleting provisions relating to publication of legal notices in newspapers; defining the term "publicly accessible website"; authorizing government agencies to publish legal notices on their websites; requiring government agencies to provide specified notice to residents concerning alternative methods of receiving legal notices, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Legal Notices

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Judiciary; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1235 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
S1710 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1102Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1210511Amended CodeSee Bill Text
121055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
12566Amended CodeSee Bill Text
16212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
166041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
189015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
190005Amended CodeSee Bill Text
194037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
197402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
200065Amended CodeSee Bill Text
316066Amended CodeSee Bill Text
338223Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3730397Amended CodeSee Bill Text
373146Amended CodeSee Bill Text
403722Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50021Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500211Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500711Amended CodeSee Bill Text
501059Amended CodeSee Bill Text
69081Amended CodeSee Bill Text
71206Amended CodeSee Bill Text
84938Amended CodeSee Bill Text
86509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
932704Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback