FL S1676 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 607
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Authorizing nursing home facilities to use paid feeding assistants in accordance with specified federal law under certain circumstances; authorizing home health aides to administer certain prescription medications under certain conditions; authorizing certified nursing assistants or home health aides to perform certain tasks delegated by a registered nurse; creating the Excellence in Home Health Program within the Agency for Health Care Administration for a specified purpose; requiring certain licensees to provide specified information about their employees in a survey beginning on a specified date, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct Care Workers

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 607
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 607
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-06SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 16 NAYS 4
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-20SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-18SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 3
2020-02-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/18/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-10SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-02-06SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-02-05SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-04SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H7053 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H607 (Similar To) 2020-03-12 - Chapter No. 2020-9

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
381026Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38140185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382008Amended CodeSee Bill Text
382011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400141Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40023Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400461Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400488Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400489Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400490Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40052Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408822Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456053Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640123Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4640156Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464018Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4642035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6269707Amended CodeSee Bill Text
62764025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276621Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276699Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text
633412Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131075Amended CodeSee Bill Text
641495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7443675Amended CodeSee Bill Text
766118Amended CodeSee Bill Text
768135Amended CodeSee Bill Text
96028Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback