FL S1702 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting certain public service announcements by specified governmental entities, persons acting on behalf of such entities, and elected officials; providing applicability; revising applicability of certain provisions relating to conflicting employment and contractual relationships; prohibiting statewide elected officers and legislators from soliciting employment offers or investment advice arising out of official or political activities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Ethics Reform

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Ethics and Elections
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Ethics and Elections; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Ethics and Elections

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
106114Amended CodeSee Bill Text
11061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
112313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123181Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1123215Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4205061Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback