FL S1704 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-05 - Died in Criminal Justice
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Expanding the scope of unlawful acts by a person infected with a sexually transmissible disease, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Sexually Transmissible Diseases

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-05SenateDied in Criminal Justice
2017-05-05SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2017-03-15SenateIntroduced
2017-03-14SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2017-03-03SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H165 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Judiciary Committee
S628 (Similar To) 2017-05-05 - Died in Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
38423Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38424Amended CodeSee Bill Text
38434Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback