FL S1710 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 10 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-03-10 - Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that each member of the authority has an absolute right to use its own reclaimed water for certain purposes, etc.
Title
West Coast Regional Water Supply Authority
Sponsors
Sen. Dana Young [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-10 | Senate | Died in Environmental Preservation and Conservation |
2018-03-10 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2018-01-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2018-01-12 | Senate | Referred to Environmental Preservation and Conservation; Community Affairs; Rules |
2018-01-05 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1303 (Same As) 2018-03-10 - Died in Natural Resources and Public Lands Subcommittee
Code Citations
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1710 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2018/1710/BillText/Filed/HTML |