FL S1714 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Providing that possession of a personal use quantity of cannabis or a cannabis accessory by an adult is a civil violation; providing for fines or community service; providing that such possession by a minor is a civil violation; prohibiting state or local penalties or obligations other than specified penalties or obligations concerning possession of personal use quantities of cannabis or cannabis accessories; prohibiting additional state or local penalties or obligations for having cannabinoids or cannabinoid metabolites in body tissue or fluid, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Cannabis

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Judiciary
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Judiciary; Criminal Justice; Rules
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1289 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1120455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
43507Amended CodeSee Bill Text
77212Amended CodeSee Bill Text
775084Amended CodeSee Bill Text
81002Amended CodeSee Bill Text
812014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
831311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89312Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893131Amended CodeSee Bill Text
8931351Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893138Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893147Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89315Amended CodeSee Bill Text
903133Amended CodeSee Bill Text
921187Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93823Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback