FL S1726 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Designating the "Parents' Bill of Rights"; providing that the state, its political subdivisions, other governmental entities, or other institutions may not infringe on parental rights without demonstrating specified information; requiring each district school board to develop and adopt a policy to promote parental involvement in the public school system; prohibiting certain health care practitioners from taking specified actions without a parent's written permission, etc.
Title
Parental Rights
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-16 | Senate | CS by Education read 1st time |
2019-04-12 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2019-04-11 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-10 | Senate | CS by Education; YEAS 5 NAYS 3 |
2019-04-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 04/10/19, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Education; Judiciary; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1171 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Judiciary Committee
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1014 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 02 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
1014 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |