FL S1726 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring birth centers to report certain deaths and stillbirths to the agency; revising provisions requiring the agency to conduct licensure inspections of nursing homes; removing a requirement that the agency annually report to the Governor and the Legislature by a specified date on the progress of implementation of electronic prescribing and, instead, requiring the agency to annually publish such information on its website, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Agency for Health Care Administration

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 731
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted CS/CS/HB 731
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-05SenateCS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-27SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-25SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS/CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 8 NAYS 0
2020-02-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/25/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-04SenateCS by Health Policy read 1st time
2020-01-31SenateNow in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
2020-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-28SenateCS by Health Policy; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Health Policy; Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H731 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-156
H1279 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1836 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
2043Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3810034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
383327Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3951055Amended CodeSee Bill Text
395602Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3957015Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3957016Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400462Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400464Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400471Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400492Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400506Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400509Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400605Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40060501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400991Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4009935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
40805Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4080611Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408062Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408063Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408802Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408803Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408806Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408808Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408809Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408811Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408820Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408821Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408831Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408909Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4089091Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409907Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409908Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409913Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409920Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409967Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409973Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42911Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42919Amended CodeSee Bill Text
42935Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429929Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456001Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456076Amended CodeSee Bill Text
45647Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276387Amended CodeSee Bill Text
6276648Amended CodeSee Bill Text
64131076Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback