FL S1744 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Board of Governors to annually report on the intellectual freedom and viewpoint diversity of each institution; requiring the State Board of Education to establish criteria for the review of new facilities and programs at Florida College System institutions for certain purposes; specifying that unexpended funds in a university operating budget may be carried forward, subject to Legislative approval; prohibiting universities and university direct support organizations from constructing, accepting, or purchasing property under certain conditions, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Higher Education

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Education
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Education; Appropriations Subcommittee on Education; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H839 (Similar To) 2019-04-29 - Laid on Table -- Companion bill SB 190 passed
S1296 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Education
H7051 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Education
H5501 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died on Calendar
S190 (Similar To) 2019-06-18 - Chapter No. 2019-103

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
100164Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1001706Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100428Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100470Amended CodeSee Bill Text
100832Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1008322Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101009Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101340Amended CodeSee Bill Text
101378Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback