FL S1758 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-30 - Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals a specified provision relating to the Workers' Compensation Administrator, to abolish the position.
Title
Workers' Compensation Administrator [CPSC]
Sponsors
Sen. Carey Baker [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-30 | Died in Committee on Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-21 | Withdrawn from General Government Appropriations -SJ 00702; Now in Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-04-14 | Now in General Government Appropriations -SJ 00550 | |
2010-04-13 | Favorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 -SJ 00550 | |
2010-04-08 | On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/13/10, 12:30 pm, 412-K | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Banking and Insurance; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means -SJ 00120 | |
2010-02-10 | Referred to Banking and Insurance; General Government Appropriations; Policy & Steering Committee on Ways and Means | |
2010-02-05 | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1015 (Similar To) 2010-04-30 - Died in Messages