FL S1758 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 9 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died in Education Pre-K - 12
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the duties of the Office of Early Learning within the Department of Education; requiring that the Office of Early Learning develop and adopt by rule unified performance standards and outcome measures for school readiness programs; requiring that the Office of Early Learning adopt a statewide, standardized contract that is limited to state and federal requirements to be used by the early learning coalitions; requiring that the prevailing market rate schedule differentiate rates by the type of child care services provided for preschool-age children participating in the Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program; requiring that a school district offering the Voluntary Prekindergarten Education Program adopt procedures that separately account for the funds received and the expenses incurred for the program, etc.
Title
Early Learning
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Died in Education Pre-K - 12 | |
2012-02-09 | On Committee agenda-- Education Pre-K - 12, 02/14/12, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Office Building --Temporarily Postponed | |
2012-01-17 | Introduced -SJ 231 | |
2012-01-17 | Referred to Education Pre-K - 12; Budget -SJ 231 | |
2012-01-06 | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
1002 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 01 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
411 | 01013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1758 |
Text | http://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2012/1758/BillText/Filed/HTML |