FL S1764 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring applicants for certification as a foreign language court reporter or a mediator, respectively, to pay fees relating to fingerprint processing; specifying the cost for fingerprint processing, etc.
Title
Fees/Foreign Language Court Reporter/Fingerprint Processing
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-18 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-04-16 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice, 04/16/19, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Favorable by Judiciary; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-27 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 04/01/19, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations Subcommittee on Criminal and Civil Justice; Appropriations |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
S656 (Related) 2019-05-02 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
H7081 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-98
H7081 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-98
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
25 | 386 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
44 | 106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |