FL S1780 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Approved by Governor -SJ 00575; Chapter No. 2010-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-03-30 - Approved by Governor -SJ 00575; Chapter No. 2010-3
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Adopts the Florida Statutes 2010 and designates the portions thereof that are to constitute the official law of the state. Provides that the Florida Statutes 2010 shall be effective immediately upon publication. Provides that general laws enacted during the 2009 regular session and prior thereto and not included in the Florida Statutes 2010 are repealed, etc.
Title
Official Florida Statutes [WPSC]
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2010-03-10 - House - House Roll Call No. 0533 - Passage (Y: 113 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0005 - Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2010-03-03 - Senate - Senate Roll Call No. 0005 - Passage (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-03-30 | Approved by Governor -SJ 00575; Chapter No. 2010-3 | |
2010-03-29 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor -SJ 00371 | |
2010-03-16 | Ordered enrolled -SJ 00260 | |
2010-03-10 | Read 3rd time -HJ 00238; Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 0 -HJ 00239 | |
2010-03-09 | Substituted for HB 7067 -HJ 00229; Read 2nd time -HJ 00229 | |
2010-03-03 | In Messages; Received, referred to Calendar -HJ 00202 | |
2010-03-03 | Read 3rd time -SJ 00181; Passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 00181; Immediately certified -SJ 00181 | |
2010-03-02 | Introduced, referred to Rules -SJ 00121; On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/16/10, 8:45 am, 110-S; Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 -SJ 00163; Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 00163; Placed on Special Order Calendar; Read 2nd time -SJ 00007 | |
2010-02-17 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading | |
2010-02-16 | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 18 NAYS 0 | |
2010-02-09 | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/16/10, 8:45 am, 110-S | |
2010-02-08 | Filed; Referred to Rules |
Same As/Similar To
H7067 (Similar To) 2010-03-09 - Placed on Special Order Calendar; Substituted SB 1780; Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 1780 (Ch. 2010-3) -HJ 00229
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
0011 | 2421 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0011 | 2422 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0011 | 2424 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
0011 | 2425 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |