FL S1780 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Renaming the Division of Alcoholic Beverages and Tobacco of the Department of Business and Professional Regulation; exempting certain activities involving marijuana from use and possession offenses; authorizing persons age 21 and over to engage in certain activities involving personal use of marijuana in limited amounts; providing limits on where persons may engage in specified activities, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Adult Use Marijuana Legalization

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1782 (Related) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
H1117 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee
H1119 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
20165Amended CodeSee Bill Text
50003Amended CodeSee Bill Text
500105Amended CodeSee Bill Text
561025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
56213Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566011Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566013Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566014Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566031Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5660311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566032Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566033Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566034Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566035Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566036Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566037Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566038Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566039Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566040Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
566042Amended CodeSee Bill Text
5690073Amended CodeSee Bill Text
89313Amended CodeSee Bill Text
893135Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback