FL S1790 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring the Department of Health to adopt statewide fee schedules for services, supplies, and care provided in hospitals and ambulatory surgical centers; providing requirements for specified licensed medical professionals for diagnostic testing and treatment plans; revising the medical benefits requirements under personal injury protection coverage, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medical Services and Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Health Policy
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-13SenateIntroduced
2019-03-08SenateReferred to Health Policy; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2019-03-01SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1317 (Same As) 2019-05-03 - Died in Health and Human Services Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3950176Amended CodeSee Bill Text
4560535Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456072Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627736Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback