FL S1792 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Specifying that local governments may enact rates to tow or immobilize vessels on private property and to remove and store vessels under specified circumstances; prohibiting counties or municipalities from enacting certain ordinances or rules that impose fees or charges on authorized wrecker operators or towing businesses; prohibiting municipalities or counties from enacting an ordinance or rule requiring an authorized wrecker operator to accept checks as a form of payment; authorizing certain persons to place liens on vehicles or vessels to recover specified fees or charges, etc.
Title
Towing of Vehicles and Vessels
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Rules |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-04 | Senate | CS/CS by Infrastructure and Security read 1st time |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-04-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS/CS by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs read 1st time |
2019-03-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 04/02/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Now in Infrastructure and Security |
2019-03-27 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-26 | Senate | CS by Community Affairs; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Community Affairs, 03/26/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-08 | Senate | Referred to Community Affairs; Infrastructure and Security; Rules |
2019-03-01 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1237 (Similar To) 2019-05-03 - Died in Community Affairs
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
125 | 0103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
125 | 01047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
166 | 04465 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
323 | 002 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
713 | 78 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
715 | 07 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
715 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |