FL S1794 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 3-1)
Status: Passed on April 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-04-09 - Chapter No. 2020-15
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Increasing the signature threshold at which the Secretary of State must transmit initiative petitions to the Attorney General for review; providing that a citizen may challenge in circuit court a petition circulator's registration with the Secretary of State; authorizing the Division of Elections or a supervisor of elections to provide petition forms in a certain electronic format; requiring that ballots containing constitutional amendments proposed by initiative include certain disclosures and statements, in a specified order, etc.
Title
Constitutional Amendments
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Judiciary Committee | Senate Ethics and Elections Committee | Sen. Travis Hutson [R] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#698 (Y: 73 N: 45 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#27 (Y: 23 N: 17 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-04-09 | Chapter No. 2020-15 | |
2020-04-08 | Approved by Governor | |
2020-04-08 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2020-03-11 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed; YEAS 73 NAYS 45 |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 23 NAYS 17 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (440834) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 10 NAYS 7 |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-14 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-02-13 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary read 1st time |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | CS/CS by Judiciary; YEAS 4 NAYS 2 |
2020-02-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Judiciary, 02/11/20, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Now in Judiciary |
2020-01-29 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections read 1st time |
2020-01-29 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-01-27 | Senate | CS by Ethics and Elections; YEAS 4 NAYS 3 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 01/27/20, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-10 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7037 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1794 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 161 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
15 | 21 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
16 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |