FL S1802 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing an exemption from public meetings requirements for portions of the Urban Core Gun Violence Task Force meetings at which exempt or confidential and exempt information is discussed; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; requiring the recording and transcription of exempt portions of such meetings; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Meetings/Urban Core Gun Violence Task Force

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-12 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#12 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-12HouseIn Messages
2020-03-12SenateCS passed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-12SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-11SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-11SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/11/20
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0
2020-02-26SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-12SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS/CS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-02-04SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-01-31SenateNow in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-01-30SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-01-28SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2020-01-10SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S652 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H201 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Justice Appropriations Subcommittee
H7101 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
9436872Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback