FL S1820 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Ethics and Elections
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the responsibilities of the Secretary of State; requiring the supervisor of elections to establish voter services centers for specified purposes; requiring the supervisor to allow an elector to deposit a voted ballot in a secure drop box; authorizing an elector to obtain a replacement ballot under specified circumstances; prescribing the timeframes by which the supervisor shall mail ballots; authorizing the supervisor to establish additional voter services centers or secure drop box locations in the event of an emergency, etc.
Title
Mail Ballot Elections
Sponsors
Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Ethics and Elections |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Ethics and Elections; Community Affairs; Rules |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H7037 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1794 passed
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
100 | 0001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
100 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
100 | 032 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
100 | 221 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
100 | 371 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 001 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 003 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 0031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 005 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 006 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 007 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 008 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 009 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 0091 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 0092 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 0121 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 013 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 043 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 045 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 048 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 049 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 051 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 131 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 151 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 171 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 23 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 24 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 43 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 49 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 51 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 56062 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 56063 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5608 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5610 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5611 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5612 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 5613 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 572 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 591 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6102 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6103 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6104 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 62 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 64 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 65 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 655 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 657 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 661 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 662 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 663 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 67 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 68 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 69 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6921 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6923 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6925 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 694 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6951 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 6952 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 697 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 71 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 715 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 733 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
101 | 74 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 014 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 031 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 101 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 141 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 166 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
102 | 168 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 047 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 0515 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 0615 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 0616 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 17 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 20 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
104 | 29 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
117 | 05 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
153 | 53 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
155 | 04 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
163 | 514 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
171 | 0413 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
256 | 011 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
394 | 459 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
741 | 406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
790 | 06 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
916 | 107 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 012 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 021 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 026 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 061 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
97 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 065 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 077 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 0981 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 255 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
98 | 461 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1820 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1820/BillText/Filed/HTML |