FL S1832 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the court to prioritize certain forms of alimony; deleting a provision authorizing the court to consider the adultery of either spouse in determining the amount of alimony; providing that the party seeking alimony has the burden of proving certain elements; prohibiting an award of rehabilitative alimony from exceeding specified timeframes; specifying what constitutes the length of a marriage for the purpose of determining durational alimony, etc.
Title
Dissolution of Marriage
Sponsors
Sen. Kelli Stargel [R] | Sen. Ed Hooper [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Judiciary |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Judiciary; Appropriations; Rules |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H843 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
61 | 08 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 13 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 14 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
61 | 19 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1832 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1832/BillText/Filed/HTML |