FL S1834 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Infrastructure and Security
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring licensed Class "K" firearms instructors to submit proof of certain training to the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services; authorizing the Department of Law Enforcement to provide certain information to the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services under certain circumstances; deleting a provision requiring the department to provide arrest information to certain agencies; requiring schools and training facilities to submit training results directly to the department and provide a copy of the results to the applicant who completed the training, etc.
Title
Private Investigative, Private Security, and Repossession Services
Sponsors
Sen. Gary Farmer [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Infrastructure and Security |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Infrastructure and Security; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1353 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
493 | 6105 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6106 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6108 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6109 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6111 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6112 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6115 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6118 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6123 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6203 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6303 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6304 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6403 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
493 | 6406 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1834 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1834/BillText/Filed/HTML |