FL S1836 | 2011 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Introduced on March 4 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-07 - Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Revises provisions relating to certain insurers serving nonresidents domiciled outside the United States who are exempt from requirements to obtain a certificate of authority. Requires a captive insurer to obtain a license and to file evidence that a person or firm with whom it intends to conduct business is reputable. Provides that a certificate of insurance for an association captive insurer does not exceed the total funds of the association members, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Insurance

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-05-07 Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2011-04-28 Withdrawn from- Rules -SJ 568
2011-04-26 CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations read 1st time -SJ 492
2011-04-14 Now in Budget -SJ 470
2011-04-13 CS/CS by Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations; YEAS 6 NAYS 0 -SJ 470
2011-04-08 Subreferred to Budget Subcommittee on General Government Appropriations -SJ 473
2011-04-07 Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2011-04-05 CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 -SJ 461
2011-03-31 On Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 04/05/11, 10:15 am, 412 Knott Building
2011-03-14 Referred to Banking and Insurance; Budget -SJ 208
2011-03-04 Filed

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
624402Amended CodeSee Bill Text
628901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
628903Amended CodeSee Bill Text
628905Amended CodeSee Bill Text
628909Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback