FL S1836 | 2012 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 7 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Died on Calendar
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Urging the United States Secretary of Health and Human Services to approve the requested federal Medicaid waivers in order to expand Florida's Medicaid managed care pilot program statewide, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Medicaid

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2012-03-09 Died on Calendar
2012-03-08 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/12
2012-03-06 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/08/12
2012-03-05 Retained on Calendar
2012-03-05 Read 2nd time -SJ 791
2012-03-02 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/12
2012-02-29 Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/02/12
2012-02-24 Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 671
2012-02-23 Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Amendments)
2012-02-22 Favorable with 1 amendment(s) by- Health Regulation (441898); YEAS 6 NAYS 1 -SJ 671
2012-02-17 On Committee agenda-- Health Regulation, 02/22/12, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2012-01-17 Introduced -SJ 240
2012-01-17 Referred to Health Regulation -SJ 240
2012-01-07 Filed

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback