FL S1860 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8005 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on April 17 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-02 - Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8005 (Adopted)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Recognizing April 28-May 5, 2019, as the "Days of Remembrance" and May 2, 2019, as "Holocaust Memorial Day" in Florida, etc.
Title
Days of Remembrance and Holocaust Memorial Day
Sponsors
Sen. Lori Berman [D] | Sen. Kevin Rader [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-02 | Senate | Adopted, companion bill(s) passed, see HR 8005 (Adopted) |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-05-02 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-04-17 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H8005 (Similar To) 2019-04-26 - Adopted by Publication, companion bill(s) passed, see SR 1860 (Adopted)
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1860 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2019/1860/BillText/Filed/HTML |