FL S1870 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1391
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Establishing the Florida Digital Service and the Division of Telecommunications within the Department of Management Services; revising information technology-related powers, duties, and functions of the department acting through the Florida Digital Service; requiring the Department of Legal Affairs, the Department of Financial Services, or the Department of Agriculture and Consumer Services to notify the Governor and the Legislature and provide a certain justification and explanation if such agency adopts alternative standards to certain enterprise architecture standards; creating the Financial Technology Sandbox within the Office of Financial Regulation, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Technology Innovation

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-09SenateLaid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1391
2020-03-09SenateSubstituted CS/CS/CS/HB 1391
2020-03-09SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-05SenateCS/CS/CS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-05SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-03-03SenateCS/CS/CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 20 NAYS 0
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-26SenateCS/CS by Banking and Insurance read 1st time
2020-02-21SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-21SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-19SenateCS/CS by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 4 NAYS 3
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-12SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 6 NAYS 4
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1872 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/HB 1393
S1874 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
H1391 (Same As) 2020-03-10 - Ordered enrolled
H1393 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Ordered enrolled
H1395 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
110205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820041Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2820051Amended CodeSee Bill Text
28200515Amended CodeSee Bill Text
282318Amended CodeSee Bill Text
2870591Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365171Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365172Amended CodeSee Bill Text
365173Amended CodeSee Bill Text
559952Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430415Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback