FL S1874 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Prohibiting the Office of Financial Regulation from waiving or modifying fees for the Financial Technology Sandbox except as specified, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Fees/Office of Financial Regulation/Financial Technology Sandbox Applications

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Appropriations
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-27SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/03/20, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building --Not Considered
2020-02-19SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by Banking and Insurance; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Banking and Insurance, 02/19/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-12SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Banking and Insurance
2020-02-11SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-10SenateCS by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2020-02-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/10/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Banking and Insurance; Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

S1870 (Related) 2020-03-09 - Laid on Table, refer to CS/CS/CS/HB 1391
H1391 (Similar To) 2020-07-01 - Chapter No. 2020-161
H1395 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in State Affairs Committee

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
559952Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback