FL S1876 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in returning Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Engrossed) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the definition of the term "food" to include hemp extract for purposes of the Florida Food Safety Act; providing that a person operating a minor food outlet that sells hemp extract is not exempt from certain food permit requirements; providing that hemp extract that does not meet certain requirements will be considered adulterated or misbranded; prohibiting the sale of certain hemp extract products to individuals under a specified age, etc.
Title
State Hemp Program
Sponsors
Senate Rules Committee | Senate Innovation, Industry, and Technology Committee | Senate Agriculture Committee | Sen. Bill Montford [D] |
Sen. Audrey Gibson [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#717 (Y: 107 N: 10 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#17 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | House | Died in returning Messages |
2020-03-14 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-03-13 | House | In returning messages |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Requested House to recede |
2020-03-13 | Senate | Refused to concur in 1 amendment(s) (800749) |
2020-03-12 | Senate | In returning messages |
2020-03-11 | House | CS passed as amended; YEAS 107 NAYS 10 |
2020-03-11 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (442671) |
2020-03-11 | House | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-10 | House | Amendment(s) adopted (870683) 1055 |
2020-03-10 | House | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-10 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20 |
2020-03-09 | House | Received |
2020-03-09 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2020-03-09 | House | In Messages |
2020-03-09 | Senate | CS passed as amended; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 |
2020-03-09 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Ordered engrossed |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Amendment(s) adopted (964152) |
2020-03-06 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/06/20 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-03 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by Rules read 1st time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-03-02 | Senate | CS/CS/CS by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2020-02-19 | Senate | CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology read 1st time |
2020-02-19 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-02-18 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-17 | Senate | CS/CS by Innovation, Industry, and Technology; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-12 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Innovation, Industry, and Technology, 02/17/20, 1:30 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-10 | Senate | Now in Innovation, Industry, and Technology |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Agriculture read 1st time |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | CS by Agriculture; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-30 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-23 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Agriculture, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Agriculture; Innovation, Industry, and Technology; Rules |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Same As/Similar To
H1063 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/CS/CS/SB 1876 passed
H921 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-135
H921 (Similar To) 2020-06-30 - Chapter No. 2020-135
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
500 | 03 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
500 | 12 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
581 | 217 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |