FL S1878 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a minimum annual appropriation for Everglades restoration and the protection of water resources in this state beginning in a specified fiscal year; specifying requirements for the allocation of such funding; providing for future repeal of the appropriation unless reviewed and saved from repeal through reenactment by the Legislature; revising the minimum annual appropriation for certain appropriations from the Land Acquisition Trust Fund, etc.
Title
Environmental Protection
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-02-06 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources read 1st time |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Now in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Pending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2020-02-03 | Senate | CS by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-29 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/03/20, 4:00 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Environment and Natural Resources; Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Filed |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
373 | 477 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
375 | 041 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |