FL S1880 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]

Summary

Providing a uniform set of conditions of restitution for juvenile offenses, regardless of whether adjudication is imposed or withheld; requiring a child's parent or guardian, in addition to the child, to make restitution for damage or loss caused by the child's offense; providing a uniform set of conditions for jurisdiction over a child's parent or guardian concerning restitution, regardless of whether adjudication is imposed or withheld, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Restitution for Juvenile Offenses

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Judiciary
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-02-12SenateCS by Criminal Justice read 1st time
2020-02-12SenateNow in Judiciary
2020-02-12SenatePending reference review under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-11SenateCS by Criminal Justice; YEAS 3 NAYS 2
2020-02-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/11/20, 10:00 am, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-30SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 02/04/20, 9:00 am, 37 Senate Building --Amendment(s) Adopted - Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-23SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/28/20, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Criminal Justice; Judiciary; Appropriations
2020-01-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1225 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
985437Amended CodeSee Bill Text
985513Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback