FL S1882 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Requiring a service provider to furnish and provide access to records within a specified timeframe after receiving a request for such records; requiring a service provider to furnish and provide access to records within a specified timeframe after receiving a request from an individual or the individual's legal representative; revising the timeframe within which a nursing home facility must provide access to and copies of resident records after receiving a request for such records, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Patient Access to Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Health Policy
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules
2020-01-13SenateFiled

Same As/Similar To

H1147 (Same As) 2020-03-14 - Died in Rules

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
3161932Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3161933Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944615Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3953025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3954025Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397501Amended CodeSee Bill Text
400145Amended CodeSee Bill Text
408833Amended CodeSee Bill Text
429294Amended CodeSee Bill Text
440185Amended CodeSee Bill Text
456057Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback