FL S1888 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Policy
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the Office of Program Policy Analysis and Government Accountability to conduct analyses of other states' use of the combined recovery care center and ambulatory surgical center model and the advanced birthing center model; requiring the office to contract with a certain entity to conduct an analysis of the impact of licensing specialty hospitals in this state and in other states, etc.
Title
Health Care Studies
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Health Policy |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Health Policy; Judiciary; Rules |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Filed |
Florida State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1888 |
Text | https://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/1888/BillText/Filed/HTML |