FL S1968 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Status: Enrolled on March 9 2012 - 75% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-03-09 - Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring a court to assess a specified fine against a defendant who pleads guilty or nolo contendere to, or who is convicted of, violating certain specified offenses if the services of a criminal analysis laboratory are used in the investigation of the offense; providing for the proceeds of the assessment to be deposited into the Operating Trust Fund of the Department of Law Enforcement and used by the statewide criminal analysis laboratory system, etc.
Title
Criminal Justice
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2012-03-09 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#1213 (Y: 116 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#915 (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2012-03-09 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#42 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-27 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#915 (Y: 100 N: 11 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2012-02-23 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#16 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-03-09 | Ordered engrossed, then enrolled -SJ 1679 | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 116 NAYS 0 -HJ 1616 | |
2012-03-09 | In returning messages | |
2012-03-09 | Passed as amended by Conference Committee Report; YEAS 40 NAYS 0 -SJ 1202 | |
2012-03-09 | Conference Committee Report received -SJ 1201 | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Budget Conference Committee on Budget/Appropriations: Alexander (Chair), Negron (Vice Chair), Bennett (At Large), Gaetz (At Large), Gardiner (At Large), Joyner (At Large), Rich (At Large), Thrasher (At Large); Budget Conference Committee on Criminal and Civil Justice/Justice: Bogdanoff (Chair), Evers, Smith, Storms; Budget Conference Committee on Education Pre-K - 12/PreK-12: Simmons (Chair), Detert, Gardiner, Montford, Ring; Budget Conference Committee on Finance and Tax: Norman (Chair), Alexander, Gaetz, Siplin; Budget Conference Committee on General Government/Government Operations: Hays (Chair), Braynon, Bullard, Diaz de la Portilla, Dockery, Jones, Thrasher; Budget Conference Committee on Health and Human Services/Health Care: Negron (Chair), Fasano, Flores, Garcia, Oelrich, Rich, Richter, Sobel; Budget Conference Committee on Higher Education/Higher Education: Lynn (Chair), Altman, Sachs, Siplin, Wise; Budget Conference Committee on Transportation, Tourism, and Economic | |
2012-02-28 | Conference Committee appointed: Representatives Glorioso (Chair), Eisnaugle, Grant, Harrell, McBurney, Metz, Perry, Pilon, Rouson, Soto, Waldman -HJ 899 | |
2012-02-27 | In returning messages | |
2012-02-27 | Refused to concur, acceded to request for conference committee -HJ 846 | |
2012-02-27 | Received -HJ 841 | |
2012-02-23 | In Messages | |
2012-02-23 | Immediately certified -SJ 615 | |
2012-02-23 | Read 2nd time -SJ 615 | |
2012-02-21 | Introduced -SJ 525 | |
2012-02-21 | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/12 | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading -SJ 525 | |
2012-02-16 | SPB 7072 submitted as a committee bill (SB 1968) by Budget |
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
921 | 187 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 055 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
938 | 25 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
943 | 361 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |