FL S7000 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Rules
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Amending provisions relating to an exemption from the public records requirements for personal identifying information contained in dental workforce surveys held by the Department of Health; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Dental Workforce Surveys/Department of Health

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-03SenateDied in Rules
2019-05-03SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2019-03-12SenateNow in Rules
2019-03-12SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2019-03-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 03/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-03-05SenateIntroduced
2019-01-22SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2019-01-09SenateFiled
2019-01-07SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Health Policy; YEAS 10 NAYS 0
2018-12-20SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/07/19, 2:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2018-12-20SenateSubmitted for consideration by Health Policy

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
466051Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback