FL S7000 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Relocating existing provisions relating to the central abuse hotline of the Department of Children and Families; revising when a person is required to report to the central abuse hotline; providing penalties for the failure to report known or suspected child abuse, abandonment, or neglect; providing responsibilities for child protective investigators relating to animal abuse and neglect; requiring the Education Practices Commission to suspend the educator certificate of certain personnel and administrators for failing to report known or suspected child abuse, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Reporting Abuse, Abandonment, and Neglect

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-06 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#36 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14HouseDied in Messages
2020-03-14HouseIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-03-06HouseIn Messages
2020-03-06SenatePassed; YEAS 38 NAYS 0
2020-03-06SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-05SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-03SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20
2020-02-19SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-19SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/19/20, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Building
2020-02-03SenateNow in Rules
2020-02-03SenateFavorable by Education; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2020-01-29SenateOn Committee agenda-- Education, 02/03/20, 1:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-18SenateReferred to Education; Rules
2019-10-22SenateFiled
2019-10-22SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-10-14SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 10/22/19, 11:00 am, 301 Senate Building
2019-10-14SenateSubmitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
1006061Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1012795Amended CodeSee Bill Text
32209Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3901Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39101Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39201Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39202Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39205Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39208Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39301Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39302Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39307Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39521Amended CodeSee Bill Text
396012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
627746Amended CodeSee Bill Text
828126Amended CodeSee Bill Text
82827Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9210022Amended CodeSee Bill Text
93403Amended CodeSee Bill Text
934255Amended CodeSee Bill Text
960065Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback