FL S7002 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 14 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-05 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision relating to an exemption from public records and meeting requirements for certain identifying information held or discussed by the State Child Abuse Death Review Committee or a local committee; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/State Child Abuse Death Review Committee
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7023 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Substituted HB 7023 |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/05/20 |
2020-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-02-21 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/26/20, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Building --Not Considered |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2020-01-27 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-11-14 | Senate | Filed |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 7 NAYS 0 |
2019-10-28 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/05/19, 2:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-10-28 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs |
Same As/Similar To
H7023 (Same As) 2020-06-24 - Chapter No. 2020-92