FL S7006 | 2017 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 24 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-05-01 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Abrogating the repeal of provisions authorizing the Department of Health to establish a direct-support organization for the prescription drug monitoring program, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Direct-support Organization of the Prescription Drug Monitoring Program

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-01SenateLaid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)
2017-05-01SenateSubstituted HB 7097
2017-05-01SenateRead 2nd time
2017-04-27SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 05/01/17
2017-03-16SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2017-03-16SenateFavorable by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2017-03-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/16/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2017-03-09SenateNow in Appropriations
2017-03-08SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2017-03-07SenateIntroduced
2017-03-03SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 03/08/17, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building
2017-02-09SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2017-01-24SenateFiled
2017-01-13SenateOn Committee agenda-- Health Policy, 01/24/17, 10:00 am, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 5 NAYS 0
2017-01-13SenateSubmitted for consideration by Health Policy

Same As/Similar To

H7097 (Similar To) 2017-06-27 - Chapter No. 2017-192
S1074 (Similar To) 2017-04-26 - Withdrawn from further consideration, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 1041 (Ch. 2017-181), CS/CS/HB 7059 (Ch. 2017-164), HB 7097 (Ch. 2017-192)

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
893055Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback