FL S7008 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on November 13 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-03-04 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7075
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Amending a provision which provides an exemption from public records requirements for certain animal medical records held by a state college of veterinary medicine that is accredited by the American Veterinary Medical Association Council on Education; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemption, etc.
Title
OGSR/Animal Medical Records/State College of Veterinary Medicine
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-04 | Senate | Laid on Table, refer to HB 7075 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Substituted HB 7075 |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20 |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2020-03-02 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 17 NAYS 0 |
2020-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/02/20, 12:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Now in Rules |
2019-12-09 | Senate | Favorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-12-02 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 12/09/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-11-21 | Senate | Referred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules |
2019-11-13 | Senate | Filed |
2019-11-12 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Education; YEAS 8 NAYS 0 |
2019-11-05 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Education, 11/12/19, 3:30 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-11-05 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Education |
Same As/Similar To
H7075 (Same As) 2020-09-08 - Chapter No. 2020-171