FL S7012 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (? 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 19 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-19 - Chapter No. 2020-39
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]

Summary

Providing additional duties for the Statewide Office for Suicide Prevention; requiring the Department of Transportation to work with the office in developing a plan relating to evidence-based suicide deterrents in certain locations; requiring that certain information be provided to the guardian or representative of a minor patient released from involuntary examination; requiring the maintenance of psychotropic medications to specified defendants under certain circumstances, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Substance Abuse and Mental Health

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-03-13 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-11 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#719 (Y: 118 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-05 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#29 (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-19 Chapter No. 2020-39
2020-06-18 Approved by Governor
2020-06-03 Signed by Officers and presented to Governor
2020-03-13SenateOrdered engrossed, then enrolled
2020-03-13SenateCS passed as amended; YEAS 38 NAYS 0 888
2020-03-13SenateConcurred in 1 amendment(s) (541211)
2020-03-11SenateIn returning messages
2020-03-11HouseCS passed as amended; YEAS 118 NAYS 0
2020-03-11HouseRead 3rd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-10HouseAmendment(s) adopted (541211) 1061
2020-03-10HouseRead 2nd time
2020-03-10HousePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/10/20
2020-03-09HouseReceived
2020-03-09HouseReferred to Calendar
2020-03-05HouseIn Messages
2020-03-05SenateCS passed; YEAS 40 NAYS 0
2020-03-05SenateRead 3rd time
2020-03-04SenatePlaced on 3rd reading
2020-03-04SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/04/20
2020-03-02SenateCS by Appropriations read 1st time
2020-03-02SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-03-02SenatePending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute)
2020-02-27SenateCS by- Appropriations; YEAS 18 NAYS 0
2020-02-24SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/27/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building
2020-02-17SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 02/20/20, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Temporarily Postponed
2020-02-17SenateNow in Appropriations
2020-02-13SenateSubcommittee Recommendation: CS by Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; YEAS 9 NAYS 0
2020-02-10SenateOn Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services, 02/13/20, 12:30 pm, 412 Knott Building
2020-01-14SenateIntroduced
2019-11-21SenateReferred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services; Appropriations
2019-11-13SenateFiled
2019-11-12SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs; YEAS 6 NAYS 0
2019-11-05SenateOn Committee agenda-- Children, Families, and Elder Affairs, 11/12/19, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2019-11-05SenateSubmitted for consideration by Children, Families, and Elder Affairs

Same As/Similar To

H577 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations
S704 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S706 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Banking and Insurance
S920 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Health and Human Services
H939 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Health Market Reform Subcommittee
H1081 (Similar To) 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table - Companion bill(s) CS/SB 7012 passed
H1071 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died on Calendar
S1554 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families, and Elder Affairs
S1678 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
H1229 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Children, Families and Seniors Subcommittee
S870 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
142019Amended CodeSee Bill Text
1420195Amended CodeSee Bill Text
334044Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39407Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394455Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3944573Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394463Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394495Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394496Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394658Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39467Amended CodeSee Bill Text
394674Amended CodeSee Bill Text
39474Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3949085Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397311Amended CodeSee Bill Text
397321Amended CodeSee Bill Text
3974012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
409972Amended CodeSee Bill Text
464012Amended CodeSee Bill Text
7442007Amended CodeSee Bill Text
916106Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91613Amended CodeSee Bill Text
91615Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources

TypeSource
Summaryhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/BillText/pb/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/BillText/Filed/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/BillText/c1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/BillText/e1/HTML
Texthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/BillText/er/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/Amendment/360222/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/Amendment/181950/HTML
Amendmenthttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/Amendment/604142/HTML
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/Vote/SenateVote_s07012c1029.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/Vote/HouseVote_s07012c1719.PDF
Roll Callhttps://www.flsenate.gov/Session/Bill/2020/7012/Vote/SenateVote_s07012c1021.PDF

Bill Comments

feedback