FL S7024 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [HTML]
Summary
Requiring the department to submit a report to the Legislature by a specified date; abrogating the scheduled repeal of provisions governing citizen support organizations established under the department; abrogating the scheduled repeal of provisions governing citizen support organizations established under the department for the benefit of the state park system, etc.
Title
Department of Environmental Protection Citizen Support Organizations
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-30 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | House | Died in Messages, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93) |
2019-05-03 | House | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-04-30 | House | In Messages |
2019-04-30 | Senate | CS passed; YEAS 39 NAYS 0 640 |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2019-04-29 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2019-04-25 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 04/29/19 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | CS by Appropriations read 1st time |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2019-03-29 | Senate | Pending reference review -under Rule 4.7(2) - (Committee Substitute) |
2019-03-27 | Senate | CS by- Appropriations; YEAS 21 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-25 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/28/19, 9:00 am, 412 Knott Building --Meeting cancelled |
2019-03-22 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations, 03/27/19, 1:00 pm, 412 Knott Building |
2019-03-07 | Senate | Now in Appropriations |
2019-03-06 | Senate | Subcommittee Recommendation: Favorable by Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-03-01 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government, 03/06/19, 2:00 pm, 110 Senate Building |
2019-02-22 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 02/13/19, 1:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources |
Same As/Similar To
H1121 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-93
S7074 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
S7074 (Similar To) 2019-04-30 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/CS/HB 1121 (Ch. 2019-93)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
20 | 2551 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
258 | 015 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |