FL S7024 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising legislative findings under the Florida Forever Act to include wildlife crossings as a land acquisition purpose; requiring the Department of Environmental Protection to consult with specified entities for certain projects related to conservation lands and coastal areas subject to flooding; requiring that certain allocations from the Florida Forever Trust Fund include a specified amount for lands in this state which have been impacted by a hurricane during a specified timeframe and meet certain requirements, etc.
Title
Florida Forever
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-14 | Senate | Died in Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government |
2020-03-14 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2020-01-22 | Senate | Introduced |
2020-01-17 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations Subcommittee on Agriculture, Environment, and General Government; Appropriations |
2020-01-14 | Senate | Filed |
2020-01-13 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Environment and Natural Resources; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2020-01-06 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Environment and Natural Resources, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 37 Senate Building |
2020-01-06 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Environment and Natural Resources |