FL S7028 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Failed on May 3 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-03 - Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Modifying provisions authorizing justices or judges to purchase additional service credit in the Florida Retirement System under certain circumstances to conform to the revisions made to the mandatory judicial retirement age established in s. 8, Art. V of the State Constitution, etc.
Title
Judicial Retirement
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-03 | Senate | Died in Appropriations, companion bill(s) passed, see CS/HB 7081 (Ch. 2019-98) |
2019-05-03 | Senate | Indefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Introduced |
2019-02-19 | Senate | Referred to Appropriations |
2019-02-13 | Senate | Filed |
2019-02-12 | Senate | Submitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0 |
2019-02-04 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 02/12/19, 4:00 pm, 301 Senate Building |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Same As/Similar To
H7081 (Similar To) 2019-06-10 - Chapter No. 2019-98