FL S7030 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Chapter No. 2016-49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Passed on March 10 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-10 - Chapter No. 2016-49
Text: Latest bill text (Enrolled) [HTML]
Summary
Amending provisions which provide an exemption from public records requirements for bids, proposals, or replies submitted to an agency in response to a competitive solicitation; amending provisions which provide an exemption from public meetings requirements for portions of meetings in which a vendor participates in a negotiation, makes an oral presentation, or answers questions as part of a competitive solicitation or in which negotiation strategies are discussed, and which provides an exemption from public records requirements for the recording of, and any records presented at, exempt portions of such meetings; removing the scheduled repeal of the exemptions, etc.
Title
OGSR/Competitive Solicitation or Negotiation Strategies
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-02-24 - House - House: Third Reading RCS#637 (Y: 113 N: 2 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
2016-01-28 - Senate - Senate: Third Reading RCS#21 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 3) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-10 | Chapter No. 2016-49 | |
2016-03-10 | Approved by Governor | |
2016-03-03 | Signed by Officers and presented to Governor | |
2016-03-01 | Senate | Ordered enrolled |
2016-02-24 | House | Passed; YEAS 113 NAYS 2 |
2016-02-24 | House | Read 3rd time |
2016-02-23 | House | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-02-23 | House | Read 2nd time |
2016-02-23 | House | Substituted for HB 7067 |
2016-02-19 | House | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 02/23/16 |
2016-02-18 | House | Received |
2016-02-18 | House | Referred to Calendar |
2016-02-02 | House | In Messages |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Passed; YEAS 37 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-28 | Senate | Read 3rd time |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Placed on 3rd reading |
2016-01-21 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2016-01-19 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 01/21/16 |
2016-01-15 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2016-01-14 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 11 NAYS 0 |
2016-01-12 | Senate | Introduced |
2016-01-11 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 01/14/16, 10:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-12-03 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2015-11-18 | Senate | Filed |
2015-11-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 11/17/15, 1:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 5 NAYS 0 |
2015-10-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 11/02/15, 4:00 pm, 401 Senate Office Building --Meeting cancelled |
2015-10-26 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Governmental Oversight and Accountability |
Same As/Similar To
H7067 (Same As) 2016-02-23 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see SB 7030 (Ch. 2016-49)
Code Citations
Chapter | Article | Section | Citation Type | Statute Text |
---|---|---|---|---|
119 | 071 | Amended Code | See Bill Text | |
286 | 0113 | Amended Code | See Bill Text |