FL S7030 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Failed on March 14 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-14 - Died in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Exempting from public records requirements active threat assessments and threat management records; providing circumstances under which such records are considered active; providing for future legislative review and repeal of the exemption; providing a statement of public necessity, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Public Records/Active Threat Assessments and Threat Management Records

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-14SenateDied in Governmental Oversight and Accountability
2020-03-14SenateIndefinitely postponed and withdrawn from consideration
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Appropriations
2020-01-14SenateFiled
2020-01-13SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Infrastructure and Security; YEAS 7 NAYS 0
2020-01-06SenateOn Committee agenda-- Infrastructure and Security, 01/13/20, 3:30 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-06SenateSubmitted for consideration by Infrastructure and Security

Same As/Similar To

S7028 (Related) 2020-03-14 - Died in Judiciary
S7056 (Similar To) 2020-03-14 - Died in Messages

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback