FL S7036 | 2015 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2015-5)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 4 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-03-18 - Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2015-5)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revising the date of the presidential preference primary, etc.
Title
Presidential Preference Primary
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-03-18 | Senate | Laid on Table, companion bill(s) passed, see HB 7035 (Ch. 2015-5) |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Substituted HB 7035 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Read 2nd time |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Introduced |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Special Order Calendar, 03/18/15 |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Placed on Calendar, on 2nd reading |
2015-03-12 | Senate | Favorable by- Rules; YEAS 12 NAYS 0 |
2015-03-09 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Rules, 03/12/15, 9:00 am, 110 Senate Office Building |
2015-03-06 | Senate | Referred to Rules |
2015-03-04 | Senate | Filed |
2015-02-26 | Senate | On Committee agenda-- Ethics and Elections, 03/03/15, 4:00 pm, 412 Knott Building -- Submitted as Committee Bill; YEAS 10 NAYS 0 |
2015-02-26 | Senate | Submitted for consideration by Ethics and Elections |
Same As/Similar To
H7035 (Same As) 2015-03-19 - Chapter No. 2015-5