FL S7036 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (? 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 15 2020 - 25% progression
Action: 2020-03-10 - Laid on Table, refer to HB 7019
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]

Summary

Abrogating the scheduled repeals of provisions relating to specified criminal intelligence information or criminal investigative information, etc.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

OGSR/Criminal Intelligence Information/Criminal Investigative Information

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-03-10SenateLaid on Table, refer to HB 7019
2020-03-10SenateSubstituted HB 7019
2020-03-10SenateRead 2nd time
2020-03-09SenateRetained on Special Order Calendar
2020-03-05SenatePlaced on Special Order Calendar, 03/09/20
2020-02-13SenatePlaced on Calendar, on 2nd reading
2020-02-12SenateFavorable by- Rules; YEAS 16 NAYS 0
2020-02-07SenateOn Committee agenda-- Rules, 02/12/20, 4:00 pm, 110 Senate Building
2020-01-27SenateNow in Rules
2020-01-27SenateFavorable by Governmental Oversight and Accountability; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-22SenateIntroduced
2020-01-22SenateOn Committee agenda-- Governmental Oversight and Accountability, 01/27/20, 1:30 pm, 301 Senate Building
2020-01-17SenateReferred to Governmental Oversight and Accountability; Rules
2020-01-15SenateFiled
2020-01-14SenateSubmitted as Committee Bill and Reported Favorably by Criminal Justice; YEAS 4 NAYS 0
2020-01-09SenateOn Committee agenda-- Criminal Justice, 01/14/20, 2:30 pm, 37 Senate Building
2020-01-09SenateSubmitted for consideration by Criminal Justice

Same As/Similar To

H7019 (Same As) 2020-03-11 - Ordered enrolled

Code Citations

ChapterArticleSectionCitation TypeStatute Text
119071Amended CodeSee Bill Text
9430583Amended CodeSee Bill Text

Florida State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback